Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 256 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1482 Week
» 21127 Month
» 55769 Year
» 1277334 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1600
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 347   26/02/1916
O4 1252   06/09/1919
O4 1243   27/02/1922
O4 6303   07/05/1927
O4 6272   09/07/1931