Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 568 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1667 Week
» 7801 Month
» 235685 Year
» 1457250 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1680
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1210   24/03/1917
O4 347   29/10/1921
O4 6206   07/02/1925
O4 6336   02/02/1929
O4 6632   03/12/1932
O4 6631   09/02/1935