Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 254 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1480 Week
» 21125 Month
» 55767 Year
» 1277332 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1120
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5347   05/06/1926
O4 6375   01/08/1931
O4 6575   30/09/1933
O4 6331   10/08/1935
O4 6369   25/09/1937