Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 115 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7575 Week
» 5088 Month
» 232972 Year
» 1454537 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1957
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1743   11/1919
O4 6353   23/06/1926
O4 6228   02/02/1929
O4 5347   20/06/1931
O4 6521   12/05/1934
O4 6314   26/09/1936
O4 6525   15/10/1938
O4 5383   24/05/1941