Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 539 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1788 Week
» 22230 Month
» 359076 Year
» 1580641 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1961
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1614   05/1918
O4 6247   14/09/1929
O4 6564   27/06/1931
O4 5347   24/02/1934
O4 6528   24/10/1936
O4 6239   03/06/1939
O4 766   18/10/1941