Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 256 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1482 Week
» 21127 Month
» 55769 Year
» 1277334 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3275
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6333   05/03/1937
O4 6268   20/05/1939
O4 5422   23/01/1943
O4 6198   23/06/1945
O4 3737   06/12/1947
O4 63617   13/05/1950