Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 270 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2177 Week
» 20959 Month
» 269252 Year
» 1153633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1866
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5348   01/10/1927
O4 6355   08/02/1930
O4 6621   21/05/1932
O4 6335   27/07/1935
O4 6270   02/12/1939