Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 627 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4226 Week
» 10360 Month
» 238244 Year
» 1459809 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3208
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6214   21/09/1935
O4 6341   28/08/1937
O4 5348   17/02/1940
O4 6201   24/04/1943
O4 6510   12/01/1946
O4 63762   04/09/1948