Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 735 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6544 Week
» 13728 Month
» 321709 Year
» 1206090 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1148
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
C5 258 THE RT. HON. VISCOUNT CROSS G.C.B. G.C.S.I. 05/08/1911
O4 349   01/03/1919
O4 2162   11/1919
O4 1250   15/10/1921
O4 6305   07/06/1930