Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 476 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6452 Week
» 12586 Month
» 240470 Year
» 1462035 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3266
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5386   31/10/1936
O4 5349   30/09/1939
O4 6598   05/09/1942
O4 6298   09/12/1944
O4 3914   25/01/1947
O4 63597   14/05/1949