Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 139 Today
» 1336 Yesterday
» 3912 Week
» 3912 Month
» 193047 Year
» 1414612 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #825
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1882   05/1918
O4 6600   09/12/1933
O4 5351   21/03/1936
O4 6219   02/04/1938
O4 6267   10/08/1940
O4 5417   17/04/1943
O4 6304   15/12/1945