Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 215 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 215 Week
» 11786 Month
» 260079 Year
» 1144460 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1006
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 384   30/09/1923
O4 5397   22/11/1935
O4 5351   12/03/1938
O4 6335   18/05/1940
O4 6338   17/01/1942
O4 6214   22/04/1944
O4 3697   14/09/1946
O4 63751   05/02/1949