Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 173 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5394 Week
» 20508 Month
» 323698 Year
» 1545263 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1010
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6206   14/10/1933
O4 6356   14/03/1936
O4 6295   28/05/1938
O4 6289   13/07/1940
O4 5351   10/12/1942