Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 507 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1606 Week
» 7740 Month
» 235624 Year
» 1457189 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3344
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6263   24/09/1938
O4 6598   23/11/1940
O4 6220   10/10/1942
O4 5351   27/10/1945
O4 3743   13/09/1947
O4 63644   06/08/1949