Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 143 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5364 Week
» 20478 Month
» 323668 Year
» 1545233 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3327
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6336   05/04/1938
O4 6365   13/07/1940
O4 5393   12/12/1942
O4 6201   16/06/1945
O4 3635   23/08/1947
O4 63609   21/05/1949