Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 32 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6339 Week
» 21453 Month
» 324643 Year
» 1546208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3347
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5379   15/10/1938
O4 6271   25/01/1941
O4 6361   29/05/1943
O4 6553   01/07/1944
O4 63635   26/03/1949