Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1289 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7678 Week
» 28120 Month
» 364966 Year
» 1586531 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1456
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1190   07/1912
O4 352   18/01/1919
O4 1223   23/07/1921
O4 6373   12/01/1929
O4 6239   11/04/1931
O4 6602   10/04/1937
O4 6340   02/09/1939
O4 6285   17/01/1942