Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1083 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 8090 Week
» 14224 Month
» 242108 Year
» 1463673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1416
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1688   11/1918
O4 6267   24/01/1925
O4 6636   20/08/1929
O4 5353   01/08/1931
O4 5383   13/01/1934