Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 793 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 20075 Month
» 323265 Year
» 1544830 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Got here
Boiler #1039
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 389   02/1914
O4 5397   07/02/1924
O4 5353   02/12/1933
O4 5387   23/09/1938
O4 6218   09/11/1940
O4 6531   22/05/1943
O4 5397   12/01/1946
O4 63694   22/01/1949