Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 581 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1680 Week
» 7814 Month
» 235698 Year
» 1457263 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3657
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15D
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5390   09/12/1939
O4 6300   07/11/1942
O4 5390   05/05/1945
O4 3643   21/06/1947