Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 329 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4067 Week
» 1580 Month
» 229464 Year
» 1451029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1005
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5354   23/08/1930
O4 6608   07/01/1933
O4 6508   11/05/1935
O4 6577   07/08/1937
O4 6325   09/05/1942
O4 6501   19/08/1944
O4 3858   07/09/1946