Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 783 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4382 Week
» 10516 Month
» 238400 Year
» 1459965 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1473
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1207   08/1912
O4 1811   10/1917
O4 355   25/01/1919
O4 6281   20/06/1929
O4 6292   15/09/1931
O4 5412   17/03/1934