Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 173 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5394 Week
» 20508 Month
» 323698 Year
» 1545263 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1968
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1658   11/1917
O4 6501   20/05/1930
O4 6593   13/08/1932
O4 5015   29/06/1935
O4 5355   15/05/1937
O4 5412   06/01/1940
O4 6559   15/05/1943
O4 6531   13/10/1945
O4 63686   24/04/1948