Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 147 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1181 Week
» 23687 Month
» 326877 Year
» 1548442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3294
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6211   12/06/1937
O4 5355   09/12/1939
O4 6574   22/08/1942
O4 6199   02/12/1944
O4 3704   02/06/1947