Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1280 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7669 Week
» 28111 Month
» 364957 Year
» 1586522 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1941
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6273   18/05/1929
O4 6309   30/05/1931
O4 5005   16/12/1933
O4 6337   21/03/1936
O4 6368   17/09/1938
O4 6528   05/07/1941
O4 5355   01/04/1944
O4 3841   04/01/1947
O4 63769   02/07/1949