Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 1191 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1191 Week
» 3773 Month
» 268406 Year
» 1489971 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #809
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6183   25/06/1927
O4 6599   21/05/1932
O4 6235   15/06/1935
O4 6358   19/06/1937
O4 6250   30/12/1939
O4 5398   11/07/1942
O4 6325   07/07/1944
O4 3624   06/12/1947