Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 519 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4257 Week
» 1770 Month
» 229654 Year
» 1451219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1948
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1949   10/1918
O4 1208   05/11/1921
O4 6579   01/04/1933
O4 6183   26/01/1935
O4 6352   10/07/1937