Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 470 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4208 Week
» 1721 Month
» 229605 Year
» 1451170 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3281
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6583   03/04/1937
O4 6183   06/01/1940
O4 6274   19/07/1941
O4 6374   28/08/1943
O4 6333   01/12/1945
O4 63571   07/08/1948
O4 63743   18/06/1949