Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 369 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7376 Week
» 13510 Month
» 241394 Year
» 1462959 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1964
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6300   17/05/1924
O4 6192   02/11/1929
O4 5385   31/01/1931
O4 6184   19/08/1933
O4 6293   24/10/1936
O4 6623   29/04/1939
O4 6607   13/09/1941