Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 143 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5236 Week
» 7818 Month
» 272451 Year
» 1494016 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3315
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6535   29/01/1938
O4 5399   08/06/1940
O4 6184   31/03/1943
O4 6638   26/01/1946
O4 63691   09/10/1948