Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1155 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1155 Week
» 3737 Month
» 268370 Year
» 1489935 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3207
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5399   14/09/1935
O4 5397   15/01/1938
O4 6243   02/03/1940
O4 5389   21/01/1943
O4 6186   02/06/1945
O4 3733   22/11/1947