Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 854 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4402 Week
» 5292 Month
» 313273 Year
» 1197654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3302
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6559   13/08/1937
O4 6336   12/07/1940
O4 6566   20/03/1943
O4 6269   06/10/1945
O4 3683   25/11/1947