Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1019 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2053 Week
» 24559 Month
» 327749 Year
» 1549314 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28802
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 63738   09/12/1950
O4 63683   08/08/1953
O4 63893   12/01/1956
O1 63596   02/08/1958