Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1144 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8598 Week
» 11180 Month
» 275813 Year
» 1497378 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #807
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6187   22/06/1927
O4 6285   16/01/1932
O4 6360   05/05/1934
O4 6365   11/07/1936
O4 6261   18/02/1939
O4 6316   28/03/1942
O4 6548   01/07/1944
O4 3845   11/01/1947
O4 63905   24/09/1949