Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3336
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6522   02/07/1938
O4 6296   08/06/1940
O4 6311   06/02/1943
O4 5387   03/03/1945
O4 3665   06/10/1947
O4 63684   18/03/1950