Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1060 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 6281 Week
» 21395 Month
» 324585 Year
» 1546150 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1863
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1188   21/08/1920
O4 6191   08/11/1924
O4 6282   15/02/1930
O4 6508   05/03/1932
O4 6579   03/12/1938