Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 35 Online
» 764 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4363 Week
» 10497 Month
» 238381 Year
» 1459946 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1340
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1690   12/1918
O4 6188   27/07/1929
O4 6605   07/06/1930
O4 6330   30/07/1932
O4 6499   02/06/1934
O4 6627   14/11/1936
O4 6285   22/10/1939