Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 165 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 165 Week
» 39211 Month
» 413224 Year
» 1634789 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3243
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6188   13/06/1936
O4 6362   22/07/1939
O4 6367   20/12/1941
O4 6521   11/03/1944
O4 3895   13/12/1947
O4 63612   01/04/1950