Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 652 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4251 Week
» 10385 Month
» 238269 Year
» 1459834 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3323
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6277   09/04/1938
O4 6306   03/08/1940
O4 6189   30/01/1943
O4 3702   06/04/1946