Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 761 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3447 Week
» 4337 Month
» 312318 Year
» 1196699 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3264
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6276   17/10/1936
O4 6628   11/03/1939
O4 6210   25/04/1942
O4 6190   19/08/1944
O4 3911   09/08/1947
O4 63620   04/03/1950