Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 993 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4592 Week
» 10726 Month
» 238610 Year
» 1460175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1956
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1800   04/1919
O4 6271   02/03/1929
O4 5012   04/12/1930
O4 6603   01/12/1934
O4 6191   16/02/1935