Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 600 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1699 Week
» 7833 Month
» 235717 Year
» 1457282 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #929
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2133   09/1919
O4 6194   10/10/1931
O4 6554   16/06/1934
O4 6210   11/07/1936
O4 6252   15/04/1939
O4 6618   14/06/1941
O4 6304   12/06/1943