Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1068 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2102 Week
» 24608 Month
» 327798 Year
» 1549363 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1882
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 393   14/05/1921
O4 6337   24/11/1928
O4 6334   16/08/1930
O4 6194   30/01/1937
O4 6249   30/03/1940
O4 6638   13/11/1942
O4 6591   22/01/1944