Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 214 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 214 Week
» 22720 Month
» 325910 Year
» 1547475 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1417
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1876   05/1918
O4 6541   21/06/1930
O4 6195   10/12/1932
O4 6621   01/06/1935
O4 6264   23/10/1937