Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 673 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3318 Week
» 5900 Month
» 270533 Year
» 1492098 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3230
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6229   25/01/1936
O4 6284   11/05/1938
O4 6195   19/10/1940
O4 6577   04/04/1942
O4 6344   22/01/1944
O4 3631   08/03/1947
O4 63781   21/01/1950