Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 698 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4297 Week
» 10431 Month
» 238315 Year
» 1459880 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28339
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63760   01/09/1951
O1 63711   31/10/1953
O1 63579   21/11/1953
O1 63630   08/09/1956
O4 63850   08/11/1958