Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1039 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 6260 Week
» 21374 Month
» 324564 Year
» 1546129 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1462
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1196   09/1912
O4 1201   17/09/1917
O4 1665   01/1918
O4 389   18/11/1922
O4 6561   24/03/1934
O4 6374   15/08/1936