Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1162 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8616 Week
» 11198 Month
» 275831 Year
» 1497396 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1496
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1230   11/1912
O4 1670   02/1918
O4 1224   09/08/1919
O4 1196   24/12/1921
O4 6354   27/08/1927
O4 6267   10/10/1931