Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 148 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 1223 Week
» 22125 Month
» 22125 Year
» 1243690 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #486
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2053   06/1919
O4 6198   01/06/1929
O4 6596   31/12/1931
O4 6532   13/10/1934
O4 6579   22/08/1936
O4 6246   31/12/1938