Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1066 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2100 Week
» 24606 Month
» 327796 Year
» 1549361 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1335
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1864   04/1918
O4 6321   07/12/1924
O4 6213   22/03/1930
O4 6198   12/12/1931
O4 6323   01/12/1934